MD HB822 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, by July 1, 2019, the Department of Budget and Management and the State Retirement Agency to finalize the development of recommendations for a phased retirement plan; requiring the Department and the Agency to consider certain options and work with certain representatives in developing the recommendations; requiring, by July 1, 2019, the Department and the Agency to submit recommendations to the Department of Legislative Services and certain committees of the General Assembly and the Joint Committee on Pensions; etc.
Title
Personnel and Pensions – Phased Retirement Plan
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 774 |
2018-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {629033/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {634065/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Legislative Services, Department of
Personal Representatives
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Time
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Legislative Services, Department of
Personal Representatives
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Time