MD HB822 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Calvert County to enter into a payment in lieu of taxes agreement with the owner of a facility for the liquefaction of natural gas; requiring an agreement for payment in lieu of taxes to include specified provisions; providing that specified property of the owner of a natural gas facility is exempt from county property tax as provided in a payment in lieu of taxes agreement; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Calvert County
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fuel
Personal Property
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Calvert County
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Fuel
Personal Property
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local