MD HB819 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Montgomery County district council from adopting or enforcing a local law that requires the creation of new off-street parking for a residential development that is located within a 0.25-mile radius of a present or planned Metro or Purple Line station.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery County - Off-Street Parking Requirements Near Mass Transit Stations MC/PG 106-23

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-20SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2023-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (128-0)
2023-03-16HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2023-02-13HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Land Use22109(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback