MD HB819 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the process by which a person who is denied a certain handgun permit or renewal of a permit or whose permit is revoked or limited may appeal the decision; providing that appeals from a certain decision by the Secretary or the Secretary's designee may be made to the Handgun Permit Review Board; requiring the Board to review a certain record and hold a certain hearing; providing that an appeal of the Board's decision may be made to the Office of Administrative Hearings within 30 days after the decision is issued; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals

Sponsors

Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]
Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]
Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]
Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]
Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]
Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]
Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]
Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]
Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-31) (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-51) (Y: 85 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (98-31)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {868774/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (84-51)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0819&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0819f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0819t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0819e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_253_hb0819e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0819_86877401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0819.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0819_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0353.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0819_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1083.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1139.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback