MD HB818 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a driver may move out of or into a lane by authorizing the move when the driver has reasonably determined it is safe to do so and activated the appropriate turn signal; and prohibiting a person from moving a vehicle right or left on a roadway in order to change lanes unless the person gives an appropriate signal in a specified manner.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane Changes
Sponsors
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Del. Marice Morales [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-11) (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-11) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {810014/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |