MD HB817 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a conviction for violation of a certain protective order from merging with a conviction for a certain other crime; and authorizing a sentence for violation of a certain protective order to be imposed separate from and consecutive to or concurrent with a certain other sentence.
Title
Criminal Law – Violation of a Protective Order – Merger Prohibition and Separate Sentence Authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Family Law
Penalties and Sentences
Protection Orders
Repeat Offenders
Criminal Law - Procedures
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Family Law
Penalties and Sentences
Protection Orders
Repeat Offenders
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 4 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |