MD HB817 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain unit of State government proposing a regulation affecting small businesses to include a certain certification stating whether a certain comparable regulation has been adopted by a unit of local government in a certain economic impact analysis rating and a certain economic impact analysis in a certain manner; and authorizing a certain unit of State government to include a certain statement in a proposed regulation under certain circumstances.
Title
Regulations Affecting Small Businesses - Certification of Comparable Local Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 333 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {236384/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB720 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Ethics
Examinations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Ethics
Examinations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 2 | 1505.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |