MD HB817 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the amount that a member of the Employees' Pension System who is considered to have been a specified legislative employee must pay to the Board of Trustees of the State Retirement and Pension System to purchase credit for eligibility service for a specified period of legislative employment; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees' Pension System - Purchase of Credit for Eligibility Service - Legislative Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274
2017-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
2017-03-29SenateHearing canceled
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
2017-03-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2017-02-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-27HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2017-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback