MD HB817 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Decreasing a specified limitation on noneconomic damages in health care malpractice claims arising on or after October 1, 2015, to $500,000; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Malpractice - Limitation on Noneconomic Damages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-18HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary
2015-03-11HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback