MD HB817 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit for alternate power sources at retail service stations; establishing when the tax credit may be granted; establishing that the tax credit shall be equal to no more than the lesser of 100% of the value of the alternate power source or $20,000; defining "alternate power source" and "retail service station"; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power Sources

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-25SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2013-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2013-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-20HouseFloor Committee Amendment {395160/1 Adopted
2013-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {735268/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2013-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback