MD HB817 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified alcoholic beverages license holders in Prince George's County from the requirement of obtaining an entertainment permit before providing entertainment on their licensed premises; clarifying that a holder of an entertainment permit in Prince George's County must comply with zoning and use and occupancy laws and regulations; requiring an applicant for an entertainment permit to submit evidence to the satisfaction of the Board of License Commissioners regarding specified taxes due; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Permit -
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 103890/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Veterans
Zoning and Planning
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Veterans
Zoning and Planning