MD HB817 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Imposing a 2% tax on the gross receipts from the short-term lease or rental of heavy equipment property by a person whose principal business is the short-term lease or rental of heavy equipment property at retail; requiring a person who owns a business with gross receipts subject to the tax to submit a report to the Department of Assessments and Taxation and a list to the county or municipal corporation where the business is located; providing that specified heavy equipment property is not subject to personal property tax; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Heavy Equipment Tax Reform Act of 2010

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-08 Third Reading Passed (139-1)
2010-04-06 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-04-06 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-04-12 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2010-02-10 Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-09 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback