MD HB816 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a person who makes three or fewer mortgage loans per calendar year and brokers not more than one mortgage loan per calendar year from the Maryland Mortgage Lender Law.
Title
Financial Institutions - Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |