MD HB815 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain lung cancer diagnostic imaging and limiting the copayment, coinsurance, or deductible that the entities can require for lung cancer screening and diagnosis; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct an assessment on certain outreach, education, and health disparities in cancer screening and report the results to the General Assembly by January 1, 2024.
Title
Cancer Screening - Health Insurance and Assessment of Outreach, Education, and Health Disparities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354 |
2023-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {403825/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {943028/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB965 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Subjects
Diseases
Education
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Education
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Rules and Regulations