MD HB815 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from stating on a label of a food product that the product is milk unless the product meets a certain definition; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish and implement a plan to enforce a certain prohibition, including notice of the Department's intent to implement a ban on all products that do not meet certain requirements, including plant-based products mislabeled as milk; and requiring the Department to notify the Department of Legislative Services within 10 days of a certain occurrence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health – Milk – Labeling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-32) (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (107-32)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFloor Committee Amendment {840517/1 Adopted
2019-04-06HouseMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Stein) Adopted
2019-04-05HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {310213/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-15HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-15HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback