MD HB815 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from stating on a label of a food product that the product is milk unless the product meets a certain definition; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish and implement a plan to enforce a certain prohibition, including notice of the Department's intent to implement a ban on all products that do not meet certain requirements, including plant-based products mislabeled as milk; and requiring the Department to notify the Department of Legislative Services within 10 days of a certain occurrence.
Title
Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-32) (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-32) |
2019-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-06 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {840517/1 Adopted |
2019-04-06 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Stein) Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {310213/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Advertising
Agriculture
Animals
Commerce and Business
Food
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Labeling
Milk Products
Notices
Retail Sales
Sunset
Agriculture
Animals
Commerce and Business
Food
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Labeling
Milk Products
Notices
Retail Sales
Sunset