MD HB812 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in consultation with 2-1-1 Maryland, to make certain recommendations relating to the establishment of an opt-in mental health services phone call program that would require a center to call individuals who have opted into the mental health services phone call program on a periodic basis and attempt to connect individuals to a provider of mental health services under certain circumstances; authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation to carry out the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2-1-1 Maryland - Mental Health Services Phone Call Program (The Thomas Bloom Raskin Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2021-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2021-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-11HouseFloor Amendment {223729/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
2021-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {406181/1 Adopted
2021-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-02-04HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB719 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General241204(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback