MD HB812 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a local authority to allow a person to cross a highway under its jurisdiction on an all-terrain vehicle at a right angle to access a farm or to move from one part of a farm to another part of the same farm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to Farms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281
2015-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2015-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2015-04-01SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2015-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2015-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-18HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2015-03-05HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback