MD HB812 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that a political subdivision shall send a bill for water service to the property, the property owner, or the property owner's designee for each property served on a monthly, quarterly, or semiannual basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Water Service - Billing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Motion Special Order until later today (Pipkin) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Pipkin) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-04 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-07 Third Reading Passed (45-0)
2010-04-07 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (17-28)
2010-04-07 Motion Special Order later today (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (14-31)
2010-04-07 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin)
2010-04-06 Special Order 4/12 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2010-04-06 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin)
2010-04-06 Special Order 5:10 P.M. (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2010-04-06 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin)
2010-04-06 Motion Special Order 4/12 (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (15-32)
2010-04-05 Special Order 4/10 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
2010-04-04 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-04 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-08 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-03-22 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-19 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-04-08 Returned Passed
2010-03-18 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2010-03-16 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-16 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-15 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2010-02-10 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-09 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback