MD HB811 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain public school employers to provide an exclusive representative with access to new employee processing; requiring that the structure, time, and manner of certain access be determined through certain negotiations; authorizing certain parties to request certain impasse proceedings under certain circumstances; requiring the public school employer to provide the exclusive representative with certain information within 30 days of the date of hire or by the first pay period after the date of hire; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {883528/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {733328/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33) (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-49) (Y: 85 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {123324/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-84) (Y: 51 N: 85 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {763129/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-84) (Y: 50 N: 85 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23SenateFloor Amendment {733328/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33)
2018-03-23SenateFloor Amendment {883528/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)
2018-03-22SenateSpecial Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (84-49)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {123324/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-84)
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {763129/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-84)
2018-03-13HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {605868/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0811&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0811f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0811t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_22_hb0811t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0811_60586801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0811_12332401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0811_76312901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0811_73332801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0811_88352801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0811.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0811_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0381.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0382.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0455.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0811_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0783.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0784.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0823.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback