MD HB810 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the maximum income limits on eligibility for a certain credit against the State income tax for certain child and dependent care expenses; making the credit refundable, subject to certain income limits; increasing, each year, certain income eligibility and refundability thresholds by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations

Sponsors

Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]
Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]
Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Del. Nick Charles [D]
Del. Paul Corderman [R]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Debra Davis [D]
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]
Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]
Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]
Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Ron Watson [D]
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Joseph Boteler [R]
Del. Jason Buckel [R]Del. April Rose [R]Del. Teresa Reilly [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Bob Long [R]
Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Julian Ivey [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {609738/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {465962/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0810&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0810f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0810t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0810e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0810_46596201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0810_60973801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0810.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0810_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0648.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0810_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0985.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1217.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback