MD HB810 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum income limits on eligibility for a certain credit against the State income tax for certain child and dependent care expenses; making the credit refundable, subject to certain income limits; increasing, each year, certain income eligibility and refundability thresholds by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609738/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {465962/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |