MD HB81 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB406

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter during extreme weather conditions, subject to certain exceptions; defining "extreme weather conditions" as temperatures below 32 degrees Fahrenheit or above 90 degrees or during an active weather warning; making a violation a civil offense; applying certain penalties ranging from a warning for a first violation to a fine of up to $1,000 for a third or subsequent offense; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (121-9)
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-07-28HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB122 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
HB406 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law10623(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback