MD HB808 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definitions of "supervisory employee" and "management personnel" by removing a provision that status as a supervisory employee and management personnel may be determined by certain negotiations between a certain public school employer and a certain employee organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education – Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees – Supervisory Employees and Management Personnel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-41) (Y: 92 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-44) (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (91-41)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {427671/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (93-44)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0808&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0808f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0808t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0808e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0808_42767101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0808.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0808_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0415.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0808_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1049.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1134.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/veto_letters/hb0808.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback