MD HB807 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the amounts of and process for appropriating highway user funds that are required to be distributed to Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities in certain fiscal years; requiring that certain capital highway grants may be made only under certain circumstances; requiring that in certain fiscal years highway user revenues are required to be used as authorized under the Transportation Trust Fund; repealing certain obsolete distributions of highway user revenues and transfers of highway user revenues for certain fiscal years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {659736/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {480411/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0807&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0807f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0807t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0807e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_330_hb0807e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0807_48041101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0807_65973601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0807.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0807_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0262.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0807_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1088.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback