MD HB804 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a certain whistleblower reward program within the Office of the Comptroller; providing that a certain whistleblower who voluntarily provides certain information to the Comptroller shall be entitled to receive a certain monetary award under certain circumstances; providing for the determination and allocation of the amount of an award if two or more whistleblowers are eligible for the award; providing that the determination of the amount of the award shall be solely in the discretion of the Comptroller; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 463128/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 86 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 383629/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 91 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-09SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-03-22SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (96-39)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFloor Amendment {463128/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (43-86)
2021-03-20HouseFloor Amendment {383629/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (39-91)
2021-03-20HouseFloor Committee Amendment {695569/1 Adopted
2021-03-19HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {715565/1 Adopted
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-01-29HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB916 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General1401(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General1402(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General1403(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General1404(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General1405(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General1406(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General1407(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General1408(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General131103(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0804?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0804f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0804t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_515_hb0804t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0804_71556501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0804_69556901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0804_38362901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0804_46312801.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0644.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0645.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0721.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1121.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback