MD HB801 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding Calvert County to the list of counties where an existing agricultural building used for agritourism is not considered a change of occupancy that requires a building permit under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calvert County – Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-24SenateHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-19HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety12508(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback