MD HB801 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law permitting specified preexisting condition limitations in group and blanket health insurance contracts and policies; altering provisions of law relating to specified preexisting condition exclusions in individual health benefit plans to comply with requirements of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; clarifying the circumstances in which a grace period provision applies under a qualified health plan; requiring a student health plan to comply with the requirements of specified federal regulations; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-8) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-6) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {826488/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Claims
Contests
Contracts
Diseases
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Higher Education
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Prices
Students
Time
Contests
Contracts
Diseases
Federal Government
Fees
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Higher Education
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Prices
Students
Time