MD HB800 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to develop a mobile locator application for use by an individual while on the waters of the State; providing the purpose of the mobile locater is to use interactive maps so an individual can determine their location, in real time, relative to certain leases, bars, and sanctuaries, and any other areas the Department deems relevant; and authorizing the Department to contract with a third party to develop the mobile locator application.
Title
Natural Resources - Waters of the State - Mobile Locator Application
Sponsors
Del. Jerry Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169 |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {900416/1 Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Clams
Data
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Mobile Devices
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Rules and Regulations
Clams
Data
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Mobile Devices
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 11A-10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 11A-12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |