MD HB800 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified provisions of law do not prohibit insurance producers from charging and collecting from insureds actual expenses incurred by the insurance producer for payment of the premium for a policy by use of a credit card, subject to specified conditions; requiring an insurance producer, under specified circumstances, to fully disclose the availability of all acceptable payment methods and any charge for actual expenses incurred by the insurance producer for payment of a premium by use of a credit card; etc.
Title
Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44 |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {533194/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Credit
Disclosure
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Disclosure
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes