MD HB8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB395
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that funds in a certain renewable and clean energy programs account within the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund be used for the Maryland Healthy Soils Program; requiring that $500,000 of the renewable and clean energy programs account be allocated to the Maryland Healthy Soils Program; and terminating the Act after September 30, 2026.
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Use of Proceeds for Maryland Healthy Soils Program
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2020-12-29 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-09-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB395 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Agriculture
Energy
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Soil Conservation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Energy
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Soil Conservation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |