MD HB798 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain vision screenings to be given in the year that a student enters a school system, enters the first grade, and enters the eighth or ninth grade unless evidence is presented that a student has been tested by an optometrist or ophthalmologist within the past year; requiring the results of certain screenings be given to the parents or guardians of certain students with certain educational materials; and requiring that certain additional information be provided to parents or guardians of students who fail a certain vision screening.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {153827/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {195769/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0798&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0798f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0798t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_311_hb0798t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0798_15382701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0798_19576901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0798.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0798_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0414.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0798_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1122.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback