MD HB797 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-4)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Patuxent Institution and each local correctional facility and each correctional facility in the Division of Correction to have a written policy and procedure in place requiring that menstrual hygiene products be provided at no cost to a female inmate at certain times; requiring the Director of the Patuxent Institution and the managing official of a correctional facility to ensure that the correctional facility has a sufficient supply of menstrual hygiene products to meet the needs of the inmate population at all times; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products

Sponsors

Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Mary Carozza [R]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]
Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]
Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Deb Rey [R]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]
Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]
Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Chris West [R]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {872818/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback