MD HB794 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Opioid Restitution Fund Advisory Council in the Maryland Department of Health to provide specific findings and recommendations regarding the allocation of money from the Opioid Restitution Fund; and altering the permissible uses for the Fund and the requirement that the Governor consult with certain persons to identify recommended appropriations from the Fund.
Title
Public Health – Opioid Restitution Fund Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {153426/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {403427/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Data
Examinations
Governor
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Municipal Corporations
Opioids
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Data
Examinations
Governor
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Municipal Corporations
Opioids
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 7.5 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7.5 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7.5 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7.5 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7.5 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 331 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |