MD HB791 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that it is lawful under certain provisions of law for an employee or agent of a financial institution that accepts deposits in the State to intercept and record a certain oral communication under certain circumstances; providing that a certain audio recording shall be preserved for at least 30 calendar days; requiring a financial institution to adopt an audio recordings retention policy; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {497779/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {433890/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Jameson) Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {433890/1
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback