MD HB790 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry or a court to require a certain employer to pay a civil penalty equal to 10% of the amount of damages owed by the employer for violating the Equal Pay for Equal Work Law two or more times within a 3-year period; and requiring that a civil penalty be paid to the General Fund of the State to offset the cost of enforcing the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Pay for Equal Work - Enforcement - Civil Penalties (Equal Pay Remedies and Enforcement Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-30) (Y: 110 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-02SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (110-30)
2019-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {393893/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback