MD HB788 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Procurement Advisor to the Board of Public Works to establish common minimum qualifications for vacant procurement officer positions and a standardized selection test to administer to minimally qualified candidates; requiring that training policies for procurement officers require certification in State procurement law within 60 days after hire; requiring that the training policies prohibit a noncertified procurement officer from taking certain actions regarding a procurement contract; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Procurement Officers - Hiring Practices and Certification
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Job Training
Procurement
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
State Government - Personnel
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Job Training
Procurement
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
State Government - Personnel
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |