MD HB786 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, to the extent reasonably possible, the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to adhere to the standards of the American Corrections Association for restrictive housing in State correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-5) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (131-5)
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {982614/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback