MD HB782 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1253
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain members of a volunteer fire company to equip their privately owned vehicles with red and green or red and white lights or signal devices.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Lighting - Privately Owned Vehicles
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1253 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB838 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
SB838 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Subjects
Emergencies
Fire Protection
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Volunteers
Fire Protection
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 22 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |