MD HB781 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Equitech Growth Fund in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to support the economic competitiveness and inclusive growth of emerging and advanced industries in the State through the creation of supporting infrastructure assets, resources, and a diverse workforce that builds the strengths of the State's economy; establishing the Equitech Growth Commission to create a strategic plan; requiring the Governor in each of fiscal years 2025 through 2033 to include $5,000,000 in the annual budget bill; etc.
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Equitech Growth Fund and Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-4) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-18) |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {943527/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB699 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic Development
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Investments
Loans
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic Development
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Investments
Loans
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 488 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |