MD HB781 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting individuals who have successfully obtained a high school diploma by examination from certain requirements relating to the Guaranteed Access Grant, subject to certain qualifications; requiring certain individuals to meet certain qualifications under certain circumstances; altering a certain age for eligibility for the Guaranteed Access Grant under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by Examination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {105567/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-20HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback