MD HB78 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in an annual report certain statistics on job classifications for inmate labor, certain daily wage scales, and the total number of inmates currently employed at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in a report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain similar statistics regarding inmate employment and wages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-30) (Y: 110 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-08SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-07HouseThird Reading Passed (109-30)
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-04HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback