MD HB78 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in an annual report certain statistics on job classifications for inmate labor, certain daily wage scales, and the total number of inmates currently employed at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in a report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain similar statistics regarding inmate employment and wages.
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-30) (Y: 110 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-30) (Y: 110 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-30) |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Correction, Division of
Prisoners
Public Safety
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Prisoners
Public Safety
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment