MD HB78 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified provisions of law to require the State Archives to compile, edit, and publish an online Maryland Manual that describes the State, its government, and federal officials and agencies directly related to the State; requiring, as provided in the State budget, the State Archives to update the Maryland Manual to maintain its accuracy and to annually preserve a version that contains changes made in the preceding year; encouraging the Archivist to reach out to specified entities regarding the availability of the Maryland Manual; etc.
Title
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552 |
2017-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {776587/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2017-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Archives
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Historical Matters
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Archives
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Historical Matters
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures