MD HB777 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a credit card processor from assessing or charging a fee, fine, or penalty that exceeds $500 if a business entity cancels a merchant processing agreement in certain circumstances; prohibiting any fee, fine, or penalty if a business entity terminates a merchant processing agreement after the expiration of the initial term; requiring a merchant processing agreement to include certain information; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 296
2019-04-01HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-01HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27SenateFloor Amendment {893522/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {953299/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0777&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0777f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0777t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0777e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_296_hb0777e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0777_95329901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0777_89352201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0777.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0777_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0514.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0777_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0887.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1061.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback