MD HB777 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from smoking marijuana in a public place, in or on a public conveyance, or in any specified area otherwise accessible to the public; establishing a penalty of a fine not to exceed $500 for violation of the Act; providing that a conviction under the Act is a shieldable conviction for a specified purpose; providing for the expungement of a conviction under the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-34) (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Pena-Melnyk) {353629/1 Rejected (29-99) (Y: 29 N: 99 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed (102-34)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Angel) {703929/1 Rejected
2016-03-17HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) {353629/1 Rejected (29-99)
2016-03-17HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Atterbeary) {253125/1 Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Clippinger) {253522/1 Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {963229/7 Adopted
2016-03-15HouseSpecial Order until 03/16 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
2016-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {142817/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2016-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0777&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0777f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0777t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0777_14281701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0777_25312501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0777_25352201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0777_35362901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0777_70392901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0777_96322907.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0777.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0777_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0777,h-0502&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0777,h-0700&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback