MD HB777 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that certain statutory provisions relating to limited liability companies apply unless otherwise agreed on in the limited liability company's articles of organization, in the operating agreement, or by unanimous consent; repealing the requirement that the purposes for which a limited liability company is formed be stated in the articles of organization; altering the requirements for a resident agent; repealing provisions relating to a member's authority regarding abandoning the business; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Act - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-26 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-03-25 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-25 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-29 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2012-03-12 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2012-03-28 Returned Passed
2012-03-09 Third Reading Passed (138-0)
2012-03-07 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-07 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-06 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2012-02-13 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-09 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback