MD HB777 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that specified powers are granted to code home rule and charter home rule counties in addition to powers granted in the Express Powers Act under Article 25A, ยง 5 of the Annotated Code; providing that the additional powers are supplemental and not intended to limit specified other powers; clarifying that specified other provisions of law apply to specified types of counties; clarifying that specified provisions of law apply to Baltimore City; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government - Applicability of Laws to Counties and Baltimore City

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-20 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-05 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2010-04-04 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-04 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-08 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-03-17 Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-12 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-04-02 Returned Passed
2010-03-11 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2010-03-09 Second Reading Passed
2010-03-09 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-03-08 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
2010-02-10 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-09 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback