MD HB775 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain State employees may be entitled to parental leave with pay; establishing a maximum of 60 days of parental leave that employees may use for the care and nurturing of a child within 1 year after the birth or adoption of the child; providing that an employee may use parental leave only after obtaining approval from a certain appointing authority; prohibiting an employee from receiving certain payment unless the employee takes a certain action; and requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to adopt regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employees - Parental Leave

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-37) (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (100-37)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {734160/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback