MD HB773 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Power Plant Research Program to conduct a study of regulatory reforms and market incentives that may be necessary or beneficial to increase the use of energy storage devices in the State; requiring the Program to consult with specified entities and interests in conducting the study; prohibiting the cost of the study from exceeding $125,000 per fiscal year; requiring the Program to make its final report and recommend policy actions to specified Committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-20) (Y: 119 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-34) (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-34) (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-20) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {467176/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (107-34) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {683193/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Equipment
Industry and Technology
Power Plants
Prices
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Equipment
Industry and Technology
Power Plants
Prices
Procurement
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Utilities
Utility Regulation